Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Chandler, Katherine Wanda, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Chandler, Ernest Stamps Jr, in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County, FL, . Hamilton County, FL Superior Courts with BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 12, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHamilton County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY OF FLORIDA'S DRIVER'S LICENSE - KATHERINE W. CHANDLER | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING - (COSENT AND WAIVER BY PARTIES) | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 11/2/2021 @ 4:00PM | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Event FINAL HEARING - DR scheduled on 11/2/2021 at 0400 PM, MX - Judge PAUL BRYAN presiding. | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00 | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Payment received: $408.00 Receipt Number MX 48091 | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Judge: BRYAN , PAUL S Assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.