Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Waits, David Lee Jr, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Waits, Sabrina Kathleen, in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County, FL, . Hamilton County, FL Superior Courts with BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 10, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHamilton County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY OF FLORIDA DRIVER'S LICENSE (DAVID WAITS) | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLVING MARRIAGE | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING BY VIDEO CONFERENCING - THURSDAY, NOVEMBER 4, 2021 AT 9:30 A.M. | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Event FINAL HEARING - DR scheduled on 11/4/2021 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge PAUL BRYAN presiding. | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Judge: BRYAN , PAUL S Assigned | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND WAIVER | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING - (RETURN OF SERVICE - SUB. SERVED DARRYL MORRIS FOR SABRINA KATHLEEN WAITS ON 9/17/2021 | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.