Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Zanders, Jasmine Jones, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Zanders, Treyon Donshey, in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County, FL, . Hamilton County, FL Superior Courts with BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 24, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHamilton County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL - T. ZANDERS | |
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated Event LACK OF PROS HRG on 9/29/2022 0900 AM Judge WESLEY DOUGLAS results CANCELLED on 8/25/2022 | |
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Event HEARING - DR scheduled on 9/29/2022 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge PAUL BRYAN presiding. | |
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL - T. ZANDERS. | |
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION - 9/29/22 AT 9AM | |
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Event LACK OF PROS HRG scheduled on 9/29/2022 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge WESLEY DOUGLAS presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.