Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Oakley, Charlene, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Houston, James, Muncy, Megan, in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County, FL, . Hamilton County, FL Superior Courts with BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 22, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHamilton County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PETITION FOR TEMPORARY CUSTODY BY EXTENDED FAMILY | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Event FINAL HEARING - DR scheduled on 9/30/2021 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge PAUL BRYAN presiding. | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Event Time Changed:FINAL HEARING - DR set for 9/30/2021 at 0900 AM in MX with Judge PAUL BRYAN | |
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER SETTING HEARING VIA VIDEOCONFERENCING (WITH NOTARY PRESENT) - 9/30/2021 @ 9:00AM | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT AFFIDAVIT | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY OF CLOIE NICOLE HOUSTON'S BIRTH CERTIFICATE | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY OF LOGAN JAMES HOUSTON'S BIRTH CERTIFICATE | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM COURT ADMINISTRATOR'S OFFICE TO CHARLENE OAKLEY | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM COURT ADMINISTRATOR'S OFFICE TO MS OAKLEY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.