Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Florida Department Of Revenue, Hires, Tessie Leona, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gutierrez, Silbano, in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County, FL, . Hamilton County, FL Superior Courts with KOBERLEIN JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKOBERLEIN JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 07, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHamilton County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: KOBERLEIN JR, FRED Assigned | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED AND EMAILED TO ATTORNEY | |
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE - NONSERVED S. GUTIERREZ ON 10/13/22 | |
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE - NONSERVED SILBANO GTIERREZ ON 10/13/22 | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.516 | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Reopened for Civil Einforcement on 2/23/2022 | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to REOPEN | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.