Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Palencia, Susan, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County, FL, . Hamilton County, FL Superior Courts with BRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBRYAN, PAUL SPURGIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 07, 2021 |
CategoryProbate/Guardianship 44-E |
Last RefreshedFebruary 26, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationHamilton County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Estate Claim for $1,500.00 | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CLAIM; COPY MAILED TO ATTORNEY | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CLAIM; COPY MAILED TO ATTORNEY | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Estate Claim for $162,855.92 | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO CREDITORS | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION RECORDING & FILING ORIGINAL | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE & APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.