Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Onemain Financial Group Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kennard, Robert Scott, against Ruhkala, Roger Douglas, represented by In Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with SEXTON, ANDREA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 01, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED ROBERT SCOTT KENNARD (Attorney) on behalf of ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC (PLAINTIFF) Receipt: 270953 Date: 10/06/2021 | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DOES 1 TO 10 ONLY ENTERED AS REQUESTED ROBERT SCOTT KENNARD (Attorney) on behalf of ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC (PLAINTIFF) |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION PROMISSORY NOTE AND TRANSACTION HISTORY ROBERT SCOTT KENNARD (Attorney) on behalf of ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC (PLAINTIFF) |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ENTERED AS REQUESTED ROBERT SCOTT KENNARD (Attorney) on behalf of ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC (PLAINTIFF) | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | DECLARATION ROBERT SCOTT KENNARD (Attorney) on behalf of ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC (PLAINTIFF) | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - $4624.15 | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; NOTICE OF INCLUSION IN DELAY REDUCTION PROGRAM AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ADR PACKET AS TO ROGER D RUHKALA BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 3/19/2021 - BY FAX ROBERT SCOTT KENNARD (Attorney) on behalf of ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC (PLAINTIFF) | |
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: FIRST CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Date: 09/15/2021 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3 Result: VACATED
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET **BY FAX** CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET |
|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INCLUSION IN DELAY REDUCTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.