Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Davis, Robert Jason, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Davis, Ether L, represented by Roberts, John Young, in the jurisdiction of Gulf County, FL, . Gulf County, FL Superior Courts with COLLIER, DEVIN D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCOLLIER, DEVIN D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 19, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGulf County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLSD | |
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT | |
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Event CASE MAN CONF scheduled on 9/22/2023 at 1000 AM, ZM - Judge DEVIN COLLIER presiding. | |
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE COMPLETION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.