Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Rigsby, William S, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Vathis, Robin A, in the jurisdiction of Gulf County, FL, . Gulf County, FL Superior Courts with COLLIER, DEVIN D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCOLLIER, DEVIN D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 17, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGulf County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO REDIRECT PAYMENT | |
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK OF COURT ACTION REQUEST | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO REDIRECT PAYMENT | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 232023DR000064DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/17/2023 | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK OF COURT ACTION REQUEST | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | REDIRECT TO NEW PAYEE AND CREATE NEW CASE FOR NEW PAYEE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.