Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Barnes, Ann G, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Barnes, Michael E, in the jurisdiction of Gulf County, FL, . Gulf County, FL Superior Courts with COLLIER, DEVIN D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 15, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGulf County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO AMENDED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER CONSENT ORDER ON WIFES MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | LETTER | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated Event MOTION HEARING on 1/17/2023 1130 AM Judge DEVIN COLLIER results CANCELLED on 1/18/2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.