Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Haney, Jamie Elaine, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Haney, James Richard, in the jurisdiction of Gulf County, FL, . Gulf County, FL Superior Courts with COLLIER, DEVIN D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 07, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGulf County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING CASE | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLSD | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 11/17/2022 0845 AM Judge SHANNON LORD results CANCELLED on 10/31/2022 | |
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Event ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE scheduled on 11/8/2022 at 0230 PM, ZM - Judge DEVIN COLLIER presiding. | |
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND NOTICE OF HEARING | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 11/17/2022 at 0845 AM, MX - Judge SHANNON LORD presiding. | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER TO APPEAR AND/OR SHOW CAUSE | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | CHECK LIST | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | TWENTY DAYS SUMMONS | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $10.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.