Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Williams, Gary Wayne, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Williams, Minnie, in the jurisdiction of Gulf County, FL, . Gulf County, FL Superior Courts with COLLIER, DEVIN D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGulf County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLSD | |
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT | |
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER,WAIVER & REQUEST COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT | |
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event | INTERROGATORIES | |
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN MAIL | |
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event | CHECK LIST | |
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIMITATIONS OF SERVICES PROVIDED | |
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | WAIVER AND ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS | |
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER | |
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.