Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Fl Dept Of Revenue Child Sup, Palmer, Tara Elizabeth, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Sims, Grady Lee Jr, in the jurisdiction of Gulf County, FL, . Gulf County, FL Superior Courts with COLLIER, DEVIN D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGulf County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | TERMINATION OF CHILD SUPPORT | |
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO REDIRECT PAYMENT | |
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | TERMINATION OF CHILD SUPPORT | |
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO REDIRECT PAYMENT | |
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | TERMINATION OF CHILD SUPPORT | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK OF COURT ACTION REQUEST | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | OA40- FINAL ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT ORDER AND INCOME DEDUCTION ORDER | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLSD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.