Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Brant, Stanley Jason, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Studstill, Clayton Bowers, against Brant, Kayla Diane, in the jurisdiction of Gulf County, FL, . Gulf County, FL Superior Courts with COLLIER, DEVIN D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGulf County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLSD | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES | |
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 232022DR000003DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/7/2022 | |
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00 | |
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $408.00 Receipt Number MX 2022000065 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.