Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bank Of New York Mellon Trust, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Meisels, Jonathan Ian, against Combs, Lisa, United States Of America, Unknown Spouse Of Lisa Combs, in the jurisdiction of Gulf County, FL, . Gulf County, FL Superior Courts with COLLIER, DEVIN D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 31, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGulf County, FL |
|
ANSWER DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST
Date: February 10, 2022NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 17, 2022COVER SHEET
Date: January 19, 2022MOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT
Date: February 22, 2022VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLA
Date: January 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE
Date: February 22, 2022NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: January 19, 2022CLERKS DEFAULT
Date: February 23, 2022CERTIFICATION
Date: January 19, 2022NOTICE OF READINESS FOR TRIAL
Date: March 04, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: January 19, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE APRIL 14 2022 AT 11AMET
Date: April 05, 2022SUMMONS
Date: January 19, 2022TWENTY DAYS SUMMONS TO LISA COMBS
Date: January 20, 2022ORDER SETTING CASE FOR NON JURY TRIAL
Date: April 18, 2022NOTICE PAYMENT TO RECORD LIS PENDENS RECEIVED
Date: January 20, 2022ORDER STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: January 20, 2022TWENTY DAYS SUMMONS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LISA COMBS
Date: January 20, 2022TWENTY DAYS SUMMONS USOA URBAN HOUSING
Date: January 20, 2022CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: January 25, 2022CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: April 22, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SERVED ORIN COMBS 1/25/22
Date: February 01, 2022NOTICE OF FILING
Date: May 11, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SERVED LISA COMBS 1/25/22
Date: February 01, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SERVED US OF AMERICA 1/26/22
Date: February 01, 2022NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF TIME
Date: May 11, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SERVED LISA COMBS 1/25/22
Date: February 02, 2022CORRESPONDENCE SENDING ORIGINAL MORTGAGE
Date: May 12, 2022ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE
Date: May 12, 2022NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: May 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT 1
Date: May 17, 2022NOTICE OF INTENT TO OFFER AT TRIAL
Date: May 17, 2022CASE MINUTES
Date: May 23, 2022FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: May 23, 2022NOTICE OF SALE
Date: May 31, 2022AMENDED NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: June 30, 2022NOTICE OF SALE AMENDED
Date: June 30, 2022MOTION TO AMEND FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE NUNC PRO TUNC BY INTERALINEATION
Date: July 11, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING AMENDED
Date: July 22, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: July 20, 2022PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: July 25, 2022AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Date: August 15, 2022ASSIGNMENT OF BID
Date: July 27, 2022AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Date: August 17, 2022BID SHEET
Date: July 28, 2022CERTIFICATE OF SALE
Date: July 28, 2022AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE NUNC PRO TUNC BY INTERLINEATION TO MAY 23 2022
Date: August 17, 2022CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Date: August 15, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: September 07, 2022ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO AMEND FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: August 17, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: September 07, 2022WRIT OF POSSESSION
Date: September 22, 2022MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION
Date: September 07, 2022ORDER FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION
Date: September 21, 2022WRIT OF POSSESSION
Date: September 26, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to RECLOSED | |
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 4 assessed at sum $50.00 | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 4 Total Assessed $50.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $50.00 Receipt Number MX 2022002289 | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Reopened for Civil Other on 9/7/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.