Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Manypenny, Lindsay K, State Of Florida Department Of, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Blair, Robert J, in the jurisdiction of Gulf County, FL, . Gulf County, FL Superior Courts with COLLIER, DEVIN D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGulf County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to RECLOSED | |
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF CONTEMPT AND WRIT OF BODILY ATTACHMENT | |
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE MINUTES | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | AUDIT AND PAYMENT HISTORY | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Reopened for Civil Other on 1/31/2023 | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to REOP | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Event CHILD SUPPORT scheduled on 2/10/2023 at 1045 AM, MX - Judge GRANT SPITZER presiding. | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTEMPT | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ENFORCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.