Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Shore, Sarafina Laura, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Howell, Courtney, in the jurisdiction of Gulf County, FL, . Gulf County, FL Superior Courts with COLLIER, DEVIN D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 04, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGulf County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF INJUNCTION | |
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT PETITIONERS EXHIBIT 1 | |
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLSD | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Case 232021DR000165DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/4/2021 | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR INJUNCTION | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION SHEET | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.