Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Layfield, Thomas M, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Layfield, Pamela Renee, in the jurisdiction of Gulf County, FL, . Gulf County, FL Superior Courts with COLLIER, DEVIN D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 17, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGulf County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLSD | |
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Event MOTION HEARING scheduled on 4/18/2022 at 1130 AM, ZM - Judge SHANNON LORD presiding. | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING APRIL 18 2022 AT 1130AMET | |
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFAULT | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTER REGARDING DEFAULT | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE- SERVED PAMELA LAYFIELD 1/26/2022 | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | TWENTY DAYS SUMMONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.