Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Womack, Edward C, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Virga, Gerard Matthew, against Womack, Bridgette C, represented by Scott, Christopher L, in the jurisdiction of Gulf County, FL, . Gulf County, FL Superior Courts with COLLIER, DEVIN D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 22, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGulf County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLSD | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | OTHER SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE CASES | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION FEBRUARY 1 2022 AT 1PMCST | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSUR | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.