Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mcdaniel, Joyce C, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Gulf County, FL, . Gulf County, FL Superior Courts with GAY, SHONNA YOUNG presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 07, 2021 |
CategoryProbate/Guardianship 44-E |
Last RefreshedMarch 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationGulf County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION AMENDED TESTATE RESIDENT ( E FILED ) | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLSD | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION TESTATE RESIDENT ( E FILED ) | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Case 232021CP000056PRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/7/2021 | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00 | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Payment received: $345.00 Receipt Number MX 2021001416 | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION LESS THAN $1000.00 ( E FILED ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.