Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bell, Harry F Iii, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Gulf County, FL, . Gulf County, FL Superior Courts with GAY, SHONNA YOUNG presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 21, 2021 |
CategoryProbate/Guardianship 44-E |
Last RefreshedFebruary 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationGulf County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE ( E FILED ) | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLSD | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISCHARGE ( E FILED ) | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CONSENT WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING AND PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE ( E FILED ) | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTIE OF ADMINISTRATION ( E FILED) | |
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER ADMITTING EXEMPLIFIED COPIES OF WILL OF NONRESIDENT TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVES ( FILED) | |
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION ANCILLARY ( E FILED) | |
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 | |
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 2020002607 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.