Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kern, Garrett M, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case against Costa, Daniel, Montgomery, John, in the jurisdiction of Gulf County, FL, . Gulf County, FL Superior Courts with COLLIER, DEVIN D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedFebruary 28, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationGulf County, FL |
|
ORDER (RECORDED) DIRECTING COMPLIANCE WITH F.S. 57.085(7) - (E FILED)
Date: February 25, 2020ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO PROCEED AS AN INDIGENT ( E FILED)
Date: June 03, 2020ORDER DISMISSING CASE
Date: December 22, 2021MOTION TO WITHDRAW / COPIES
Date: May 13, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated Event lop on 2/1/2022 1045 AM Judge DEVIN COLLIER results CANCELLED on 12/22/2021 | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE REGARDING FEES OWED TO CLERK | |
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLSD | |
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING CASE | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW COMPLAINT | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Event lop scheduled on 2/1/2022 at 1045 AM, MX - Judge SHONNA GAY presiding. | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FAILURE TO PROSECUTE HEARING FEBRUARY 1 2022 AT 1045AMET | |
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO PROCEED AS AN INDIGENT ( E FILED) | |
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW / COPIES | |
May 06, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CORRECT / DELIVERY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.