Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Knott, Jim L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Knott, Jennifer F, in the jurisdiction of Gulf County, FL, . Gulf County, FL Superior Courts with MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY JAMES presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMCFARLAND, TIMOTHY JAMES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2019 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGulf County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Judge: MCFARLAND , TIMOTHY J Assigned | |
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event | MEMO TO CASE- COPY OF ORDER SENT BY E-MAIL TO CLAYTON STUDSTILL AND MAILED CERTIFIED COPY TO JENNIFER KNOTT 7/30/19 | |
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLSD | |
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
July 16, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event | MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER - RESPONDENT | |
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE | |
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIMITATIONS OF SERVICES PROVIDED | |
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT- RESPONDENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.