Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Henderson, Delilah P, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Gulf County, FL, . Gulf County, FL Superior Courts with MCFARLAND, TIMOTHY JAMES presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMCFARLAND, TIMOTHY JAMES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 25, 2018 |
CategoryProbate/Guardianship 44-E |
Last RefreshedFebruary 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationGulf County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION ( E FILED) | |
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE ( E FILED) | |
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLSD | |
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Judge: MCFARLAND , TIMOTHY J Assigned | |
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event | LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT DATED 03/09/2001; OF RICHARD HENDERSON (ORIGINAL) | |
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Case 232018CP000058PRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/25/2018 | |
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00 | |
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Payment received: $345.00 Receipt Number MX 2018002733 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.