Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Bank Of America N A, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Cournoyer, Derek Raymond, against Fricke, Michael Alan, Michael Alan Fricke As Persona, Unknown Heirs Beneficiaries De, Unknown Spouse Of Gerald Frick, Unknown Tenant 2 In Possession, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Glades County, FL, . Glades County, FL Superior Courts with LUNDY, JACK E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLUNDY, JACK E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2024 |
CategoryRp/Mf - Homestead Resid $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGlades County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This legal document is a foreclosure action filed by Bank of America, N.A. against parties with interests in Gerald Fricke's estate. The complaint alleges default on a Home Equity Line of Credit Short Form Mortgage, seeking payment of $79,008.48 plus...
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: January 02, 2024VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: January 02, 2024SUMMONS ISSUED- MICHAEL A. FRICKE- SENT THUR EPORTAL
Date: January 02, 2024COMPLAINT
Date: January 02, 2024SUMMONS ISSUED- UNKNOWN SPOUSE- SENT THUR EPORTAL
Date: January 02, 2024SUMMONS ISSUED- M.FRICKE- PER REP- SENT THUR EPORTAL
Date: January 02, 2024NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: January 02, 2024SUMMONS ISSUED- UNKNOWN TENANT #1- SENT THUR EPORTAL
Date: January 02, 2024SUMMONS ISSUED- UNKNOWN HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES- SENT THUR EPORTAL
Date: January 02, 2024SUMMONS ISSUED- UNKNOWN TENANT #2- SENT THUR EPORTAL
Date: January 02, 2024NOTICE
Date: January 02, 2024SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: January 04, 2024AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 06, 2024Affidavit of Diligent Search
Date: February 06, 2024NOTICE OF ACTION
Date: February 09, 2024Notice of Action- SENT TO LEGAL AD
Date: February 07, 2024RETURN OF SERVICE-MICHAEL FRICKLE
Date: February 13, 2024RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 13, 2024RETURN OF SERVICE- UNKNOWN TENTANT #2
Date: February 14, 2024RETURN OF SERVICE-UNKNOWN TENTANT #2
Date: February 14, 2024RETURN OF SERVICE- UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GERALD FRICKE
Date: February 14, 2024RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED
Date: February 16, 2024STANDING ORDER IN CIRCUIT CIVIL CASES IN THE TWENTIETH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT
Date: February 21, 2024RETURNED MAIL- UNKOWN SPOUSE OF GERALD FRICKLE
Date: February 26, 2024PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: February 28, 2024RETURNED MAIL- UNKNOWN TENTANT #2
Date: February 26, 2024LETTER
Date: March 18, 2024Affidavit of Non-military Service
Date: March 22, 2024DEFAULT ENTERED
Date: March 26, 2024NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY
Date: March 22, 2024Default for Entry by Clerk
Date: March 25, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Default for Entry by Clerk | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Non-military Service | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | LETTER | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL- UNKOWN SPOUSE OF GERALD FRICKLE | |
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL- UNKNOWN TENTANT #2 | |
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | STANDING ORDER IN CIRCUIT CIVIL CASES IN THE TWENTIETH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT | |
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.