Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ivy, Judson P., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ivy, Patricia L., in the jurisdiction of Glades County, FL, . Glades County, FL Superior Courts with LUNDY, JACK E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLUNDY, JACK E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGlades County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | RCVD FILE BACK FROM JUDGE'S OFFICE | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | FIRST ADDENDUM TO MARTIAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | FILE SENT TO JUDGES OFFICE | |
July 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Final Judgment of Dissolution of Marriage with Minor Child(ren) (Uncontested)- BOOK # 385; PAGE #232 | |
July 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Final Judgment of Dissolution of Marriage with Dependent or Minor Child(ren)- SENT THRU EPORTAL TO (ATTY) | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Final Judgment of Dissolution of Marriage with Minor Child(ren) (Uncontested)- FORWARD TO (RECORDING) | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON- RESIDENCY- JUDSON IVY | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON- RESIDENCY- PATRICIA L. IVY | |
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event | FILE SENT TO JUDGES OFFICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.