Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Gonzalez, Diane M., Sanchez, Jorge E Jr, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Perez Quintana, Priscilla, in the jurisdiction of Glades County, FL, . Glades County, FL Superior Courts with LUNDY, JACK E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLUNDY, JACK E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 25, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGlades County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE- JOSE ALFREDO CISNEROS | |
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT FILED AGAINST: | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | LETTER/ANSWER | |
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE-PRISCILLA PEREZ QUINTANA | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED PETITION | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS- PRISCILLA PEREZ QUINTANA | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS -JOSE ALFREDO CISERNOS | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event | RCVD FILE BACK FROM JUDGE'S OFFICE | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | FILE SENT TO JUDGES OFFICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.