Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Gutierrez, Joao A, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Perez, Antonio Rafael, against Barahona, Maria, Tenants, Unknown, Unknown Spouse Of Maria Baraho, in the jurisdiction of Glades County, FL, . Glades County, FL Superior Courts with LUNDY, JACK E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 02, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 23, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGlades County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 02, 2022VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: March 02, 2022NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: March 02, 2022VERIFIED COMPLAINT
Date: March 02, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED- SENT TO ATTY THRU EPORTAL FOR SERVICE
Date: March 02, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED - SENT TO ATTY THRU EPORTAL FOR SERVICE
Date: March 02, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: March 03, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE MARIA BARAHONA
Date: March 29, 2022RETURN OF NON-SERVICE - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARIA BARAHONA
Date: March 29, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE- MARIA BARAHONA
Date: March 31, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE- UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARIA BARAHONA
Date: March 31, 2022NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED BY (PLAINTIFF)
Date: April 06, 2022MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT FILED AGAINST: (DEFENDANT) AND (UNKNOWN SOURCE)
Date: April 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF DEPENDANT'S NON- MILITARY STATUS FILLED BY (PLAINTIFF)
Date: April 06, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE- UNKNOWN TENANT
Date: March 29, 2022NOTICE OF TRUST
Date: May 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS (PLAINTIFF)
Date: April 19, 2022MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED AGAINST (MARIA BARAHONA) AND (UNKNOWN TENANT)
Date: April 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT AS TO INDEBTEDNESS (PLAINTIFF) OF (DEFENDANT)
Date: April 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY TIME FEE (PLAINTIFF)
Date: April 19, 2022RETURN OF SERVICED(UNKNOWN TEANANT) ERCILIA BARABHONA ON 03/16/2022 AT 6:02 PM
Date: April 06, 2022FINAL JUDGMENT- FORWARD TO (RECORDING)
Date: June 02, 2022FINAL JUDGMENT- SENT THRU EPORTAL TO (ATTY)
Date: June 07, 2022CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED= BOOK # 386: PAGE #177
Date: August 16, 2022PROMISSORY NOTE
Date: May 27, 2022PROOF OF PUBLICATION- LAKE OKEECHOBEE NEWS
Date: June 27, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY TIME FEES (PLAINTIFF)
Date: April 19, 2022CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED- SENT THRU EPORTAL TO (ATTY)
Date: August 16, 2022NOTICE OF SALE- EMAILED TO PUBLISHER
Date: June 08, 2022PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT OF SUBSEQUENT COSTS AND INTEREST
Date: July 27, 2022FINAL JUDGMENT- BOOK # 383; PAGE #556
Date: June 03, 2022CERTIFICATE OF SALE- SENT THRU EPORTAL TO (ATTY)
Date: August 16, 2022CORRECTED : CERTIFICATE OF SALE/ CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Date: August 01, 2022Receipt Copy
Date: August 04, 2022FORECLOSURE SALE BID SHEET
Date: August 04, 2022BIDDER SIGN IN SHEET
Date: August 04, 2022CORRESPONDENCE LETTER TO CLERK AND LETTER TO GCSO
Date: August 18, 2022CERTIFICATE OF SALE- BOOK #386; PAGE #176
Date: August 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated Event FORECLOSURE SALE on 8/4/2022 1100 AM Judge JACK LUNDY results DISPOSED on 6/2/2022 | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE LETTER TO CLERK AND LETTER TO GCSO | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED: MARIA BARAHONA AND UNKNOWN TENANTS- HAND DELIVERED TO GCSO TO BE SERVED | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED= BOOK # 386: PAGE #177 | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED- SENT THRU EPORTAL TO (ATTY) | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE- SENT THRU EPORTAL TO (ATTY) | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE- BOOK #386; PAGE #176 | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Receipt Copy | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SALE BID SHEET | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | BIDDER SIGN IN SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.