Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Florida Department Of Revenue, Sherrell, Lori Ann, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Spitzer, Trever Paul, in the jurisdiction of Glades County, FL, . Glades County, FL Superior Courts with DOR, ADMIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 02, 2020 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGlades County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Copie -MAILED TO CHILD SUPPORT PROGRAM | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR CERTIFIED PAY HISTORY.. SENT THRU USPS MAIL | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET ALL PARTIES | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT ORDER | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Judge: DOR , ADMIN Assigned | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Case 222020DR000021DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/2/2020 | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | CLERK OF COURT ACTION REQUEST FROM DOR | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET (ALL PARTIES) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.