Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Fields, Shakerra Monique, State Of Fl Dept Of Rev Obo Sh, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Odoms, Lee, in the jurisdiction of Glades County, FL, . Glades County, FL Superior Courts with ATKIN, HOWARD presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 18, 2020 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGlades County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING - DR CA scheduled on 11/7/2023 at 1130 AM, HC - Judge HOWARD ATKIN presiding. | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Order of Contempt and Notice of Hearing | |
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event | LETTER | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: ATKIN , HOWARD Assigned | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | RECOMMENDED ORDER ON CONTEMPT RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR DNA TESTING | |
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Event HEARING - DR CA scheduled on 1/10/2023 at 1100 AM, HC - Judge HOWARD ATKIN presiding. | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING- 01/10/2023 AT 11:00 AM (VIA ZOOM HEARING) | |
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Event HEARING - DR CA scheduled on 10/4/2022 at 1100 AM, HC - Judge HOWARD ATKIN presiding. | |
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | 2nd *AMENDED* NOTICE OF HEARING: 10/04/2022 AT 11:00 AM (ZOOM HEARING) | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | 2nd *AMENDED* NOTICE OF HEARING: 10/04/2022 AT 11:00 AM (ZOOM HEARING) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.