Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Florida Department Of Revenue, Miggins, Brian M, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Miggins, Christopher Michael, in the jurisdiction of Glades County, FL, . Glades County, FL Superior Courts with DOR, ADMIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 25, 2019 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 13, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGlades County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event | TERMINATION OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE | |
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | CLERK OF COURT ACTION REQUEST FROM DOR | |
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET (ALL PARTIES) | |
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT ORDER | |
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | INCOME DEDUCTION ORDER ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT PROCEEDING | |
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Judge: DOR , ADMIN Assigned | |
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Case 222019DR000113DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/25/2019 | |
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event | CLERK OF COURT ACTION REQUEST FROM DOR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.