Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Garcia, Teanna, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Garcia, Moses Matehula, in the jurisdiction of Glades County, FL, . Glades County, FL Superior Courts with LUNDY, JACK E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 08, 2019 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedMarch 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGlades County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL - ORDER OF DISMISSAL (MOSES GARCIA) | |
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION | |
November 16, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO MOSES MATEHULE GARCIA (SENT BACK TO ATTY FOR SERVICE) | |
November 15, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED - MOSES MATEHULA GARCIA | |
October 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Case 222017DR000112DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/25/2017 | |
October 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
October 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.