Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Young, Henrietta Marie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Young, Jessie, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGROEB, ROBERT KIRK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | REPORT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | PRO SE HEARING DISPOSITION FORM FROM HEARING HELD 2-28-23 | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING 2-28-23 AT 10:00 AM. | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 2/28/2023 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge Robert Groeb presiding. | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: Groeb , Robert K assigned | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 212023DR000018DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/23/2023 | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00 | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | APPROVAL OF INDIGENT STATUS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.