Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Alberts, Karen Jane, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Alberts, Garrett George, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGROEB, ROBERT KIRK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 12, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 20, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGES NOTES FROM HEARING 4-3-23 | |
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | WIFE'S EXHIBIT 1-COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE FOR KAREN ALBERTS | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | REPORT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING DATE FOR NJ TRIAL 4-3-23 AT 11 AM | |
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Event NONJURY TRIAL scheduled on 4/3/2023 at 1100 AM, MX - Judge Robert Groeb presiding. | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: Groeb , Robert K Assigned | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE FOR TRIAL | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Acceptance OF SERVICE OF PROCESS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.