Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Scarborough, Jessica, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Scarborough, Joshua, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGROEB, ROBERT KIRK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 19, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 20, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | REPORT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGES NOTES FROM HEARING HELD 1-19-23 | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT #1-COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE OF JESSICA SCARBOROUGH | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Child Support Guideline Worksheet | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING DATE FOR NJ TRIAL 1-19-23 AT 1:30 PM. | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER CANCELING NJ TRIAL 2-20-23/ 2-24-23 | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.