Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Fink, Beverly Sue, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Morales Lara, Oscar Orlando, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 16, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 20, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO MEDIATION | |
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event | RECORDED ORDER DENYING RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE PARTIAL PARENTING PLAN | |
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGES NOTES FROM HEARING HELD 10-31-23 | |
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 10-24-23-2:30 PM. | |
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 10-31-23 AT 3:30 PM. | |
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 10/24/2023 0230 PM Judge Robert Groeb results CANCELLED on 10/24/2023 | |
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 10/31/2023 at 0330 PM, MX - Judge Robert Groeb presiding. | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 10-24-23 AT 2:30 PM. | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 10/24/2023 at 0230 PM, MX - Judge Robert Groeb presiding. | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITIONER'S MOTION TO REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT TO BE SET ASIDE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.