Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ryman, Elissa Beth, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Cannon, Todd Kessler, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 18, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event | RECORDED ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SUGGESTION OF DEATH | |
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY | |
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER TO THE WIFES PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 5-18-22 -WASHINGTON COUNTY | |
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 212022DR000079DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/18/2022 | |
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $418.00 | |
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $418.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.