Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Gauthier, Brenda, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gauthier, Brian, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 11, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN MAIL ON BRIAN GAUTHIER- FJ OF DOM | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | REPORT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGES NOTES FROM HEARING HELD 2-14-23 | |
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING DATE FOR NJ TRIAL 2-14-23 | |
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Event NONJURY TRIAL scheduled on 2/14/2023 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge Robert Groeb presiding. | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED BY THE CLERK (SIGNED BY CLERK) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.