Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Harrison, Casey C, Oldman, Racheal Marie, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 09, 2022 |
CategoryProbate/Guardianship 44-E |
Last RefreshedJune 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event | ORIGNAL DEATH CERTIFICATE FOR JOHN JOHNS, III. | |
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY | |
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION | |
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $345.00 Receipt Number MX 25075 | |
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT | |
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 212022CP000031CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/9/2022 | |
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00 | |
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.