Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Wheeler, Sherry Lynn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Wheeler, Kenny Lee, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTE-CLERK SENT NOTICE OF INVOICE DUE ON MEDIATION SERVICES. -KC | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | REPORT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGES NOTES FROM HEARING HELD 6-22-21 | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Event CASE MGMT-FAMILY LAW scheduled on 6/22/2021 at 1100 AM, MX - Judge Robert Groeb presiding. | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE SETTING REMOTE HEARING | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING REMOTE NON-JURY TRIAL VIA ZOOM 06/22/2021 @ 11;00AM | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE - FULL AGREEMENT | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Mediation Agreement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.