Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Byrd, George Joseph, Department Of Revenue,, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Schneider, Pamela A, against Mcdonald, Zoe M, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event | DEISGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING ADDRESS ZOE MCDONALD | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Request to Redirect Payment to New Title IV-D Case / DOR | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Demographic Information Sheet | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETTION PARENTING COURSE / ZOE MCDONALD | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY (AMENDED TO CORRECT #11 ONLY) | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGES NOTES FROM HEARING HELD 6-29-21 | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING BY ZOOM VIDEO CONFERENCE 6-29-21 AT 11 AM. | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 6/29/2021 at 1100 AM, MX - Judge Robert Groeb presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.