Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 37-D case represented by Lewis, Lisa Moury, against Mammie V Duncan Aka Mammie Dun, Tenant 1, Tenant 2, Tenant 3, Tenant 4, (total of 8) See All represented by Carter, Claire Brueck, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with BRASINGTON, MONICA J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 06, 2015 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
|
SUMMONS ON MAMMIE V DUNCAN A/K/A MAMMIE DUNCAN A/K/A MAMMIE VICTORIA DUNCAN
Date: May 06, 2015AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY
Date: July 28, 2015RETURNED MAIL ON TENANT
Date: January 11, 2016RETURNED MAIL ON MAMMIE V DUNCAN
Date: January 20, 2016RETURNED MAIL ON TENANT #2
Date: August 12, 2015NOTICE OF FIRM CHANGE AND DESIGNATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL
Date: October 15, 2015RETURN OF SERVICE NOT SERVED ON MAMMIE DUNCAN 6/9/15 @8:20AM
Date: June 30, 2015RETURNED MAIL ON TENANT
Date: August 31, 2015NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL MORTGAGE
Date: April 06, 2016MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY DEFENDANTS
Date: January 08, 2016AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION
Date: July 28, 2015NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE SETTING NON JURY TRIAL
Date: April 26, 2016ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY DEFENDANTS
Date: January 25, 2016NOTICE OF TRIAL ON 6-14-2016 AT 10:30AM
Date: April 14, 2016RETURNED MAIL ON TENANT #1
Date: August 12, 2015RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON THOMAS JAMES DUNCAN ON 3-13-2016
Date: March 21, 2016PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED TRIAL WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LISTS
Date: June 10, 2016RETURNED MAIL ON THOMAS JAMES DUNCAN
Date: September 10, 2015AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS
Date: June 10, 2016BID INFORMATION SHEET
Date: August 29, 2016NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: September 18, 2015CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT
Date: August 29, 2016WITNESS LIST PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LISTS
Date: April 14, 2016ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED ON THOMAS JAMES DUNCAN A/K/A TIMOTHY DUNCAN
Date: February 12, 2016ASSIGNMENT OF BID
Date: September 06, 2016CERTIFICATE OF TITLE TO WELLS FARGO BANK
Date: September 12, 2016PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED TRIAL WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST
Date: June 13, 2016PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED TRIAL WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LISTS
Date: May 13, 2016NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF BID
Date: September 01, 2016NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE SET FOR 8-29-2016 AT 11:00AM
Date: August 01, 2016RETURN OF SERVICE NOT SERVED ON UNKOWN SPOUSE OF MAMMIE
Date: June 30, 2015RETURN OF SERVICE NOT SERVED ON THOMAS DUNCAN
Date: June 30, 2015NOTICE OF ACTION
Date: May 15, 2015HEARING FORM FROM 12-15-2015
Date: January 11, 2016RETURN OF SERVICE NOT SERVED ON TENANT 1
Date: June 30, 2015RETURN OF SERVICE NOT SERVED ON TENANT 2
Date: June 30, 2015RETURNED MAIL ON THOMAS JAMES DUNCAN
Date: January 20, 2016PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF ACTION ON MAMMIE V DUNCAN; THOMAS JAMES DUNCAN
Date: August 25, 2015ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS RECEIVED & FILED BY THE CLERK
Date: April 08, 2016ANSWER OF DFNDTS THE UNKNOWN HEIRS ET AL
Date: September 02, 2015ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS RECEIVED & FILED BY THE CLERK
Date: September 08, 2015CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: September 09, 2015RETURNED MAIL ON MAMMIE V DUNCAN
Date: September 10, 2015NOTICE SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL ON 6-14-2016 AT 11:00AM
Date: April 22, 2016AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: May 20, 2016HEARING FORM FROM 4-12-2016
Date: April 27, 2016RETURNED MAIL ON TENANT
Date: May 02, 2016PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF SALE
Date: August 23, 2016RETURNED MAIL ON MAMMIE V DUNCAN
Date: May 09, 2016NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF CO-COUNSEL
Date: June 14, 2016NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEES AND TIME
Date: June 10, 2016AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEE AND TIME
Date: June 10, 2016Report and Recommendation of General Magistrate; FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: June 24, 2016CERTIFICATE OF SALE TO WELLS FARGO BANK IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00
Date: August 29, 2016HEARING FORM FROM 6-14-2016
Date: June 14, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE TO WELLS FARGO BANK | |
September 06, 2016 | Docket Event | ASSIGNMENT OF BID | |
September 01, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF BID | |
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | BID INFORMATION SHEET | |
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT | |
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE TO WELLS FARGO BANK IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00 | |
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Assessment 5 assessed at sum $70.00 | |
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Assessment 5 Total Assessed $70.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Payment received: $70.00 Receipt Number MX 5534 | |
August 23, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF SALE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.