Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hernandez-Rodriguez, Jose, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hernandez, Cynthia Darlene, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with MARY COKER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 25, 2014 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event | AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
November 06, 2014 | Docket Event | REPORT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
September 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Event CASE MANAGEMENT CONF scheduled on 10/21/2014 at 1030 AM, MX - Judge MARY COKER presiding. | |
September 16, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND/OR NJ TRIAL 10-21-14 | |
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT FOR CYNTHIA HERNANDEZ | |
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | NON-LOCAL PARENTING PLAN (JOSE SIGNATURE HAS NOT BEEN NOTARIZED | |
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE-CYNTHIA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.