Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Dale, Tracy, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with GRIFFIS III presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2015 |
CategoryProbate/Guardianship 44-E |
Last RefreshedMarch 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE | |
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 22, 2015 | Docket Event | STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS | |
May 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Petition for Discharge | |
May 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Waiver | |
April 02, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER ON EX PARTE PETITION TO SELL REAL PROPERTY | |
March 25, 2015 | Docket Event | PETITION TO SELL REAL PROPERTY | |
March 25, 2015 | Docket Event | STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS | |
March 11, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE | |
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.