Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Roberts, Wanda A, Roberts, David, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case against Belis, Irene S, Belis, John, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with BRASINGTON, MONICA J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2015 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2015 | Docket Event | QUIET TITLE SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT | |
April 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 4/15/2015 at 1020 AM, MX - Judge STANLEY GRIFFIS III presiding. | |
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING FOR 4-15-2015 AT 10:20AM | |
February 11, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF ACTION ON JOHN BELIS | |
February 02, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURN RECEIPT ON JOHN BELIS | |
February 02, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURN RECEIPT ON IRENE BELIS | |
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF MAILING NOTICE OF ACTION CERTIFIED MAIL TO IRENE BLISS | |
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF MAILING NOTICE OF ACTION CERTIFIED MAIL TO JOHN BLISS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.