Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Daube, Daniel J, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Killinger, Bradley Ronald, against Cotton States Mutual Insurance, Hall, Jonathan M, Hall, Timothy A, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with Monica J. Brasington presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 10, 2014 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER | |
January 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
January 11, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Mediation Agreement | |
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Event STATUS CONFERENCE scheduled on 11/6/2015 at 0920 AM, MX - Judge MONICA BRASINGTON presiding. | |
November 02, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT COTTON STATES MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITY | |
October 30, 2015 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITY | |
October 02, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING DEFENDANT COTTON STATES MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FILING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO COTTON STATES MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S SECOND REQUEST TO PRODUCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.