Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Wells Fargo Financial System F, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Wadler, Joan Weitzenkorn, against Orkney, Christine K, Orkney, Jackson D, Unknown Tenant 1, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with GRIFFIS, STANLEY HOWARD III presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2014 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedJanuary 02, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
|
SUMMONS TO JACKSON ORKNEY
Date: July 30, 2014SUMMONS TO UNK TENANT 1
Date: July 30, 2014ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER1
Date: August 12, 2014CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: July 30, 2014FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: May 11, 2015RETURN OF SERVICE NOT SERVED ON UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 1
Date: August 29, 2014COMPLAINT
Date: July 30, 2014MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: July 30, 2014NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: May 11, 2015RETURN OF SERVICE ON CHRISTINE K ORKNEY ON 8-14-2014
Date: August 29, 2014NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: July 30, 2014RETURN OF SERVICE ON JACKSON ORKNEY ON 8-14-2014
Date: August 29, 2014VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: July 30, 2014SUMMONS TO CHRISTINE ORKNEY
Date: July 30, 2014ANSWER FROM DEFENDANTS, CHRISTINE K ORKNEY AND JACKSON ORKNEY
Date: September 05, 2014AMENDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: November 21, 2014AMENDED VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT
Date: November 21, 2014MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: November 21, 2014Payment received: $18.50 Receipt Number MX 1174
Date: May 12, 2015HEARING FORM FROM 6-8-2015-CANCELLED
Date: June 08, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2015 | Docket Event | HEARING FORM FROM 6-8-2015-CANCELLED | |
May 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Assessment 4 assessed at sum $18.50 | |
May 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Assessment 4 Total Assessed $18.50 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
May 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Payment received: $18.50 Receipt Number MX 1174 | |
May 11, 2015 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
May 11, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS | |
May 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Updated Event CASE MANAGEMENT CONF on 6/8/2015 0930 AM Judge STANLEY GRIFFIS III results CANCELLED on 5/11/2015 | |
May 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Event CASE MANAGEMENT CONF scheduled on 6/8/2015 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge STANLEY GRIFFIS III presiding. | |
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE, ORDER REQUIRING PRESENTAITON OF ORIGINAL NOTE AND SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON MENDING MOTIONS FOR 6-8-2015 AT 9:30AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.