Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank National Asso, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Fishman, Barry Stuart, against Cray, Leisa, Cray, Mark A, Unknown Parties In Possession, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with GRIFFIS, STANLEY HOWARD III presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 18, 2014 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedJanuary 02, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
|
COMPLAINT
Date: July 18, 2014CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: July 18, 2014MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: July 18, 2014RETURN OF SERVICE ON LEISA CRAY ON 8-11-2014
Date: August 27, 2014MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULTS ISSUED AGAINST MARK CRAY AND LEISA CRAY ON 9-19-2014
Date: September 18, 2014SUMMONS TO UNK PARTIES #1
Date: July 18, 2014ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: July 25, 2014RETURN OF SERVICE NOT SERVED ON UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2
Date: August 27, 2014RETURN OF SERVICE ON MARK A CRAY ON 8-11-2014
Date: August 27, 2014RETURN OF SERVICE NOT SERVED ON UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1
Date: August 27, 2014NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE
Date: July 18, 2014NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: July 18, 2014VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: July 18, 2014AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES
Date: January 05, 2015SUMMONS TO UNK PARTIES #2
Date: July 18, 2014SUMMONS TO LEISA CRAY
Date: July 18, 2014SUMMONS TO MARK CRAY
Date: July 18, 2014AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS
Date: January 05, 2015AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL
Date: January 05, 2015NOTICE OF HEARING ON 3-9-2015 AT 9:30AM
Date: January 26, 2015NOTICE NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY
Date: September 18, 2014NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE
Date: September 16, 2014MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES
Date: January 05, 2015CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Date: May 27, 2015CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT
Date: May 27, 2015AFFIDAVIT AS TO THE AMOUNTS DUE AND OWING
Date: January 05, 2015AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Date: August 12, 2015NOTICE OF FILING COPY OF ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS
Date: February 20, 2015HEARING FORM FROM 3-9-2015
Date: March 09, 2015NOTICE OF SALE FOR 5-11-2015 AT 11:00AM
Date: March 11, 2015ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS RECEIVED & FILED BY THE CLERK
Date: February 24, 2015PROOF OF PUBLICATION FOR FORECLOSURE SALE ON 5-11-2015
Date: March 31, 2015BID INFORMATION SHEET
Date: May 12, 2015Report and Recommendation of General Magistrate, ORDER FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: March 11, 2015CERTIFICATE OF SALE
Date: May 12, 2015Receipt
Date: August 13, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Receipt | |
August 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Assessment 5 assessed at sum $27.00 | |
August 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Assessment 5 Total Assessed $27.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
August 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Payment received: $27.00 Receipt Number MX 1969 | |
August 12, 2015 | Docket Event | AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT | |
May 12, 2015 | Docket Event | BID INFORMATION SHEET | |
May 12, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
May 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Assessment 4 assessed at sum $70.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.