Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Amar, Tania Marie, against Pinkston, Ddebra Martin, Pinkston, Jerome D, Unknown Tenant 1, Unknown Tenant 2, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts with GRIFFIS, STANLEY HOWARD III presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 11, 2014 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedMarch 02, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 11, 2014COMPLAINT
Date: June 11, 2014SUMMONS TO DEBRA MARTIN PINKSTON
Date: June 11, 2014NOTICE OF FILING COPY OF NOTE
Date: May 06, 2015RETURN OF SERVICE NOT SERVED ON UNK TENANT 1
Date: July 22, 2014NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL
Date: June 11, 2014MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: June 17, 2014ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER
Date: June 26, 2014SUMMONS TO UNK TENANT 1
Date: June 11, 2014VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: June 11, 2014SUMMONS TO UNK TENANT 2
Date: June 11, 2014SUMMONS TO JEROME PINKSTON
Date: June 11, 2014NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: June 11, 2014NOTICE OF SALE FOR 11-23-2015 AT 11:00AM
Date: July 21, 2015RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON DEBRA MARTIN PINKSTON 7/10/14
Date: July 22, 2014RETURNED MAIL ON JEROME D PINKSTON
Date: May 15, 2015PROOF OF PUBLICATION FOR SALE DATED 11-23-2015 AT 11:00AM
Date: November 23, 2015RETURN OF SERVICE NOT SERVED ON UNK TENANT 2
Date: July 22, 2014RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON JEROME PINKSTON 7/10/14
Date: July 22, 2014NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANT #1 AND UNKNOWN TENANT #2
Date: May 06, 2015HEARING FORM FROM 7-14-2015
Date: July 14, 2015NOTICE SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL TO 7-14-2015 AT 10:00AM
Date: June 16, 2015RETURNED MAIL ON DEBRA MARTIN PINKSTON
Date: May 15, 2015HEARING FORM FROM 5-11-2015
Date: June 08, 2015NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY STATUS
Date: May 06, 2015PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST
Date: July 01, 2015NOTICE OF HEARING FOR 7-14-2015 AT 10:00AM
Date: May 22, 2015NOTICE SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL ON 7-14-2015 AT 10:00AM
Date: June 16, 2015FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: July 14, 2015ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS RECEIVED & FILED BY THE CLERK
Date: July 14, 2015PLAINTIFF'S COMPOSITE EXHIBIT 1
Date: July 14, 2015PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST
Date: June 11, 2015NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF APPEARANCE
Date: July 15, 2015BID INFORMATION SHEET
Date: November 23, 2015CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Date: December 08, 2015CERTIFICATE OF SALE
Date: November 23, 2015CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT
Date: November 23, 2015NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE FOR 11-23-2015 AT 11:00AM
Date: July 17, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION FOR SALE DATED 11-23-2015 AT 11:00AM | |
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | BID INFORMATION SHEET | |
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT | |
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $70.00 | |
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 Total Assessed $70.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Payment received: $70.00 Receipt Number MX 2875 | |
July 21, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE FOR 11-23-2015 AT 11:00AM | |
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Report and Recommendation of General Magistrate, ORDER FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.