Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Messick, Kenneth, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Hunt, Corrina C, against Ware Oil And Supply Company, in the jurisdiction of Gilchrist County, FL, . Gilchrist County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 10, 2014 |
CategoryNegligence- Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGilchrist County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S AMENDED DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES | |
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event | TRANSFER OF CASE TO LEVY COUNTY-CERTIFICATE OF THE CLERK | |
August 13, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR TRANSFER OF CASE AND TRANSFER OF COURT FILING FEES | |
August 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
August 07, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR TRANSFER OF CASE AND TRANSFER OF COURT FILING FEES | |
August 04, 2014 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL | |
August 01, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION | |
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES | |
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND FOR IMPROPER VENUE | |
June 10, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO WARE OIL & SUPPLY COMPANY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.